MEDWAY OPERA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the advancement and improvement of general education in relation to all aspects of the study,rehearsal and public performance by amateur performers of opera,light opera,choral and dramatic works. In general this means rehearsal and performance of operatic productions and concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 30 September 2003: Standard registration
- 18 September 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.02k | £2.15k | £2.71k | £1.83k | £2.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.09k | £1.73k | £4.23k | £2.22k | £2.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | 30 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | 25 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 21 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES DATED 24 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
2) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE STUDY, REHEARSAL AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCE BY AMATEUR PERFORMERS OF OPERA, LIGHT OPERA, CHORAL AND DRAMATIC WORKS WITH SUCH PROFESSIONAL ASSISTANCE WHICH MAY BE NECESSARY TO ACHIEVE THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARD AND IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OBJECTS WHATEVER THE WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION, DONATION, GUARANTEE OR OTHERWISE AND GENERALLY TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE MEDWAY KENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window