PENNY LANE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education among young people resident in south Liverpool. In particular, but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing, to provide or assist in the provision of local history for the said young people. The conservation of the enviroment within the area of benefit. The provision of recreational facilities in the interest of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 29 September 2003: Standard registration
- PLDT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KURT TRUMAN | Chair | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ARMITAGE-TRUMAN | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAULA GAINER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.38k | £58.15k | £57.77k | £50.61k | £51.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.22k | £44.34k | £61.55k | £72.36k | £72.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.35k | £13.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £29.43k | £5.64k | £1.25k | £1.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 11 AND 25 YEARS AND RESIDENT IN SOUTH LIVERPOOL. IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A DROP-IN CENTRE FOR THE SAID YOUNG PEOPLE (B) THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AND (C) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH LIVERPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 PENNY LANE
LIVERPOOL
L18 1BW
- Phone:
- 07906842189
- Email:
- info@pldt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window