NORTH EAST HELP LINK TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support, care, comfort and temporary accommodation for people in greatest need within the North East of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Darlington
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 02 December 2003: Standard registration
- 28 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1150721 THE LIVING WAY
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1152656 Newcastle Foodbank
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1151665 MIDDLESBROUGH FOODBANK
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1185044 SUNDERLAND COMMUNITY SOUP KITCHEN LTD
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1170235 NEH (NORTH EAST HOMELESS)
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1036149 THE PEOPLE'S KITCHEN LIMITED
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1194304 GENESIS PROJECT MIDDLESBROUGH
- 28 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1146989 THE MOSES PROJECT
- THE HELP LINK (Working name)
- THE NORTH EAST HELP LINK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.33k | £14.58k | £14.16k | £20.85k | £9.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.55k | £20.97k | £20.30k | £13.10k | £74.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, CARE, COMFORT, AND TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION."
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STOCKTON ON TEES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window