Financial history HIVE BRADFORD

Charity Number: 1100741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £227.96k £318.46k £143.74k £170.44k £101.63k
Total expenditure £213.87k £235.21k £205.14k £193.07k £169.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £200
Income from government grants £27.50k £34.90k N/A £42.46k £28.45k