Trustees AIDCAMPS INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1101059

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE ELAINE VINCENT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Terri Sweeney | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Cook | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Cotton | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Clark | Trustee | 16 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Wright | Trustee | 07 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE HORNE | Trustee | 26 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.