Trustees THE SHADWELL COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1100271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Moules Chair 20 September 2018
None on record
Anisha Chandrasekar Trustee 04 February 2025
SWADHINATA TRUST
Received: On time
Marzia Chowdhury Trustee 04 February 2025
None on record
Sunita Nahar Trustee 04 February 2025
None on record
Sonja Dunser Trustee 09 November 2024
None on record
Liz Zaremba Trustee 09 November 2024
None on record
Asad Kara Trustee 28 January 2023
None on record
Alexander Macdonald Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record
Jurate Brazaityte Trustee 06 June 2020
None on record
Peter Perren Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record