FRIENDS OF NAZARETH HOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As the Friends of Nazareth House we raise money to support Nazareth House and the residents. We have held concerts , silent auctions and an annual fete to raise funds which are spent on outings and entertainment for the residents. We have also spent money on equipment for the use of the residents eg. wheelchairs and special equipment. Donations are received and applied for the above purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 November 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 08/11/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.59k | £2.53k | £6.00k | £2.89k | £498 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.08k | £3.26k | £9.86k | £440 | £536 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 November 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 November 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 12 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 12 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 05 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF AGED, SICK, OR INFIRM RESIDENTS OF NAZARETH HOUSE RESIDENTIAL CARE HOME, CHELTENHAM AND, IN PARTICULAR, BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES; AND TO OTHERWISE ASSIST THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOME, THEREBY IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS
Area of benefit
CHELTENHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window