Accounts and annual returns KENSINGTON HOUSING TRUST COMMUNITY FUND

Charity number: 1099367
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 18 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 13 August 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 27 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 13 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 04 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 13 August 2008 On Time