Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE SEFTON

Charity number: 1100450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM HIGNETT Chair
None on record
Erin Harvey Trustee 10 April 2025
None on record
Daniel Donald Kilroy Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Valerie Roberts Trustee 08 May 2021
None on record
Linda Heap Trustee 26 March 2020
None on record
Bernard Culshaw Trustee 06 March 2014
None on record
ALISON MOIRA GIBBON Trustee
None on record