SOMALI FAMILY LEARNING AND REGENERATION PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supplementary support classes for refugee children (5-16yrs). School-home support services (newsletters, interpreting, parent evenings). Educational visits & day trips. Sport and recreation activities. Basic advice and information support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ealing
Governance
- 09 May 2005: Standard registration
- MR ALI OSMAN- CO-ORDINATOR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SULAYMAN IBRAHIM ABDISALAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NADIYA YUSUF | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MUNA AHMED | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
AHMED BILE | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CUMAR MAHAMED ADEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.80k | £9.86k | £9.86k | £6.60k | £40.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.36k | £6.41k | £8.01k | £18.04k | £41.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE SOMALI FAMILIES GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SOUTHALL (IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING) SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY; (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WHO ARE REFUGEES OR WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH RELIEF IN THE WIDER SOMALI COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE IN SOUTHALL (IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING) BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND AN ADVOCACY SUPPORT SERVICE FOR THOSE NEEDING TO CONTACT MAINSTREAM SERVICE PROVIDERS INCLUDING: CORPORATE AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES AND OTHER BODIES, SCHOOLS, HOSPITALS, DOCTORS SURGERIES, LEGAL SERVICES, HOUSING AUTHORITIES AND BENEFIT AGENCIES; (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SOUTHALL IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING) IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SEE FIT INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING, BY: (A) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; AND (B) PROMOTING THE CULTURAL HERITAGE OF THE SOMALI PEOPLE; (4) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SOUTHALL (IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING), IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
SOUTHALL (IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING)
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RESOURCE CENTRE
FEATHERSTONE TERRACE
SOUTHALL
UB2 5AL
- Phone:
- 02089179343
- Email:
- SOFALE@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window