AFRICAN MANDE UNION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To set up a special campaign, by working closely with the National blood service and the local African community in the UK to encourage blood donation from the African community, Set a special trust to fund a clean drinking water campaign, by proving water wells in various parts of Africa , because we strongly believe that" wells save lives".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 12 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IBRAHIM TURAY ACCA ACMA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dimitri Yates | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALHAJI MOHAMED JABBIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HASSAN SHEKU DABOH DABOH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALIE KOROMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YAYAH TURAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IBRAHIM DABOH DABOH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.00k | £23.50k | £22.20k | £11.87k | £48.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.00k | £21.20k | £39.94k | £1.80k | £48.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 July 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 June 2023 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 December 2020 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THOSE IN NEED IN THE UK AND AFRICA.
Area of benefit
UK AND AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 21
Morrison House
Tulse Hill
London
SW2 3PP
- Phone:
- 07789771979
- Email:
- turayy@aol.co.uk
- Website:
-
wwwafricamandeunion.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window