CARNFORTH AND DISTRICT TWINNING ASSOCIATION IN ASSOCIATION WITH SAILLY SUR LA LYS

Charity number: 1103426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To benefit the inhabitants of Carnforth and District including the relief of poverty and the advancement of education. To provide facilities for recreation and other leisure time occupation for the inhabitants irrespective of ethnic origin, gender, or religious belief, in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,850
Total expenditure: £7,119

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Lesley Joy Simon Chair 06 March 2023
None on record
Bernard Simon Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.63k £1.15k £499 £2.35k £6.85k
Total expenditure £4.84k £208 £99 £4.08k £7.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 April 2022 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 CONDER BROW
CARNFORTH
LA5 9XQ
Phone:
01524736740
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available