CATKIN PUSSYWILLOW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty distress and sickness,the advancement of education and the protection of health,such other charitable purposes as the trustees in their absolute discretion think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CELIA ATKIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
BARRY GOLD M.A. | Trustee |
|
||||||||
RAYMOND IAN HARRIS FCA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.49k | £151.75k | £150.02k | £250.22k | £132.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £289.90k | £183.90k | £154.15k | £150.40k | £109.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADLER SHINE LLP
ASTON HOUSE
CORNWALL AVENUE
LONDON
N3 1LF
- Phone:
- 02083713000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window