HAMPTON HILL PLAYCENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drop-in centre for children under 5 and parents and carers in Boro' of Richmond. Safe environment quality play and resources. Welcome to all sections of community, including all cultures and families with additional needs. Encourage good parenting skills. Training centre for childcare students. Informal counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 12 July 2004: Standard registration
- 18 June 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.95k | £12.71k | £11.06k | £8.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.84k | £13.64k | £11.08k | £8.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 23 February 2012 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED 30 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN BY: A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING PLACEMENTS FOR STUDENTS, SUPPORTING THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AN TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES, ENSURING THAT THE GROUP OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS; AND B) PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF CHILDREN'S NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE HAPTON HILL, GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window