Financial history OLMEC

Charity number: 1100007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £323.00k £204.00k £203.65k £258.06k £318.34k
Total expenditure £305.00k £198.00k £195.51k £219.46k £315.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £177.58k £307.81k
Income from government grants £309.20k £50.00k £154.75k N/A N/A