Accounts and annual returns THE POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN CENTRE - ARCHWAY

Charity number: 1099757
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 March 2018 On Time