Plymouth Basketball Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing access to basketball for all ages and abilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 16 April 2004: Standard registration
- PLYMOUTH MARJON BASKETBALL CLUB (Previous name)
- PLYMOUTH RAIDERS DEVELOPMENT (Previous name)
- THE TAMAR VALLEY CANNONS BASKETBALL CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Paul Spurrier | Chair | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Andrew Stubbs | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Spurrier | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.42k | £10.64k | £23.42k | £33.35k | £39.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.76k | £6.77k | £25.16k | £33.22k | £41.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/08/2014 as amended on 10 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PLYMOUTH, DEVON AND CORNWALL BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BASKETBALL.
Area of benefit
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF PLYMOUTH, DEVON AND CORNWALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
133 Compton Avenue
PLYMOUTH
PL3 5DE
- Phone:
- 07793742492
- Website:
-
HTTPS://PLYMOUTHBASKETBALLCLUB.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window