THE SCHOOL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All activities of the School Fund are to benefit the education and welfare of the pupils at Glade Hill Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 May 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 13 October 2003: Standard registration
- 23 January 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GLADE HILL PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 18/05/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.75k | £11.50k | £11.59k | £13.49k | £15.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.90k | £15.14k | £12.09k | £12.99k | £18.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 May 2018 | 09 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 24 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 03 February 2017 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF GLADE HILL PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL, AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LEA OR DEPT OF EDUCATION AND SKILLS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window