Financial history FRIENDS OF VALENTINES MANSION

Charity number: 1101835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.72k £119 £3.26k £2.50k £2.83k
Total expenditure £1.96k £1.40k £2.36k £8.49k £5.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A