Financial history FERTILITY NETWORK UK

Charity Number: 1099960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £323.79k £467.72k £451.66k £638.30k £579.04k
Total expenditure £361.11k £349.91k £426.46k £644.36k £792.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £227.14k £119.82k £146.88k £298.08k £114.10k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £25.21k £10.33k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £490.14k £459.29k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £576 £8.01k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £122.38k £101.41k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £644.36k £792.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £71.18k £123.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0