Accounts and annual returns INSIDE JOB THEATRE PROJECTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1100018
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2011 31 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 Not Required