GIVE2GIVE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
**IN LIQUIDATION** A RE-USE CHARITY AIMING TO IMPROVE THE LIVES OF PEOPLE IN NEED ACROSS BROMLEY.FUNDS RAISED FROM SALES OF DONATED ITEMS ARE USED TO PROVIDE AFFORDABLE FURNITURE TO PEOPLE EXPERIENCING POVERTY OR HARDSHIP,FREE SERVICES FOR LOCAL PEOPLE IN NEED,HELP FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE,ENCOURAGEMENT OF RE-USE,RECYCLING & PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY HELPING SMALL CHARITIES & COMMUNITY GROUPS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 10 October 2003: Standard registration
- 15 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £643.65k | £606.14k | £529.65k | £481.04k | £469.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £696.70k | £612.55k | £599.97k | £482.86k | £448.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £54.43k | £28.85k | £9.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £588.52k | £577.27k | £190.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £320.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £150 | £23 | £29 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £555 | £0 | £9.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £32.86k | £47.77k | £322.31k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.24k | £35.39k | £9.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 10 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 10 May 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 22 September 2016 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 22 September 2016 | 114 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/07/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/03/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY RE-USE AND RECYCLING TO PROVIDE SAFE, CLEAN AND AFFORDABLE FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO PEOPLE IN, OR VULNERABLE TO, HARDSHIP OR POVERTY, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS. 2. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE IN, OR VULNERABLE TO, HARDSHIP OR POVERTY, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF FREE SERVICES SUCH AS (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) A COMMUNITY MINIBUS SCHEME, A CARAVAN HOLIDAY SCHEME, PROVIDING FREE FURNITURE AND CARRYING OUT GARDENING AND DECORATING PROJECTS. 3. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT BY ENCOURAGING RE-USE AND RECYCLING OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND BY PROMOTING WASTE REDUCTION. 4. TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, WORK EXPERIENCE AND VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THOSE WITH SUPPORT NEEDS. 5. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND/OR SERVICES, AND BY DONATING GOODS TO NOT-FOR-PROFIT COMMUNITY GROUPS AND SMALL CHARITIES WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHOSE OBJECTS ARE (OR INCLUDE) TO PREVENT PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND/OR TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND/OR TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window