Financial history OC INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity Number: 1099900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £53.36k £55.70k £85.30k £37.30k £63.37k
Total expenditure £56.30k £51.63k £87.51k £42.11k £53.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A