Trustees North Staffs Advanced Drivers and Riders
Charity number: 1100497
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Williams | Chair | 12 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marie Champenois | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Mitchell | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Theobald | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Crowther | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Baggley | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Morris | Trustee | 12 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN MCCUE | Trustee | 14 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MCCUE | Trustee | 10 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAN MARK KINDER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.