Accounts and annual returns HIGHSTED GRAMMAR SCHOOL : SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1099528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window