THE NORTH WESTERN NATURALISTS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and appreciation of the public in the natural history of the North West in all its aspects, the protection of the environment, the protection of flora and fauna and such other related subjects as the trustees shall in their absolute discretion from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PAUL EARL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Phil James | Trustee | 07 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER MANSFIELD | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mike Anthony Walton | Trustee | 01 April 2005 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY AGNES FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.11k | £3.92k | £4.42k | £1.35k | £467 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £3.83k | £4.23k | £1.33k | £548 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MARCH 2004, AS AMENDED 5 MARCH 2005 as amended on 02 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURAL HISTORY OF THE NORTH WEST IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, THE PROTECTION OF FLORA AND FAUNA AND SUCH OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE..
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST, OF THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mrs P M Francis
c/o Gallery Oldham
Greaves Street
Oldham
OL1 1AL
- Phone:
- 01514768847
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window