DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT FRIENDS OF IGANGA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Situated almost on the Equator, Iganga is a lively market town in central Uganda. Following an initial local authority link, the 'Friends' was set up in 2001. Activities of the Friends centre on public health and education. Projects centre on environmental health and medical services, supporting an orphanage and community groups, and working with schools in Iganga and UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northamptonshire
- Uganda
Governance
- 11 November 2003: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF IGANGA (Working name)
- DAVENTRY FRIENDS OF IGANGA (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WALSH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA BARHAM | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GORDON SMALLMAN | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CAMPLING | Trustee | 08 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANICE MORROTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK RAVINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAREY MINHINNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER CHARLES MINHINNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.65k | £6.15k | £7.03k | £9.18k | £13.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.36k | £5.06k | £8.19k | £7.61k | £8.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 28 OCTOBER 2003 AND 10 MAY 2006 CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 07/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN IGANGA BY SUCH ACTIVITIES AS, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROVIDING SCHOOL BOOKS AND EQUIPMENT, INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON HEALTH RELATED MATTERS, ADVICE TO SMALL BUSINESSES, AND BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS AND CULTURE OF THE COMMUNITY OF IGANGA WITHIN THE DAVENTRY DISTRICT, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE.
Area of benefit
IGANGA, UGANDA, & DAVENTRY DISTRICT IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Christchurch Drive
DAVENTRY
Northamptonshire
NN11 4RD
- Phone:
- 01327871377
- Email:
- info@friendsofiganga.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window