Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTE FOR CRIMINAL POLICY RESEARCH (ICPR)

Charity number: 1100866
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2017 13 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 March 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2015 06 June 2016 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 06 June 2016 6 days late