Financial history THE INSTITUTE FOR CRIMINAL POLICY RESEARCH (ICPR)

Charity number: 1100866
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £619.63k £640.39k £1.28m £448.82k £155.70k
Total expenditure £769.97k £697.71k £831.03k £591.34k £472.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £50.00k £73.44k £621.96k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £568.51k £566.84k £656.25k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.12k £119 £4.75k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £694.08k £626.82k £822.21k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.74k £11.23k £8.82k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £67.14k £0 £0 N/A N/A