CHILDREN FOR CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUND RAISING BY APPEALS TO SUPPORT WORK OF SPECIFIC RELATED CHILDREN'S CHARITY OPERATING IN ROMANIA. COORDINATING TEAMS OF VOLUNTEERS VISITING THE RELATED CHARITY IN ROMANIA TO UNDERTAKE MAINTENANCE AND OTHER PROJECT WORK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Romania
Governance
- 04 September 2003: Standard registration
- COPII PENTRU CRISTOS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John McHardy | Chair | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Ferries | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ali Mansefield | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mansfield | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||
VALERIE WHITE | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.49k | £17.31k | £37.30k | £18.37k | £28.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.85k | £19.39k | £36.85k | £16.34k | £18.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 AUGUST 2003.
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF CHILDREN (AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, CHILDREN IN ROMANIA) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, INCLUDING BY MEANS OF SUNDAY SCHOOLS AND BIBLE CLUBS AND OTHERWISE; B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN (AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, CHILDREN IN ROMANIA); C) TO RELIEVE CHILDREN (AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, CHILDREN IN ROMANIA) WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ILLNESS, DISEASE OR DISABILITY; AND D) TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN (AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, CHILDREN IN ROMANIA) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR, ROMANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Watermead Road
PORTSMOUTH
PO6 1LL
- Phone:
- 02392439667
- Email:
- cfc.white@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window