Financial history CIDA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1099275
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £148.44k £377.84k £12.88k £5.92k £7.87k
Total expenditure £249.15k £307.60k £78.98k £45.74k £48.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A