EAST MIDLANDS FUNDING FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The East Midlands Funding Forum is an information, training and support network for Funders. The Funding Forum supports its membership by network meetings and themed training events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 07 September 2004: Standard registration
- EAST MIDLANDS FUNDERS FORUM (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael McGrath | Chair | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Graham | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|||||
DAWN WATTS | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
GARY BEHARRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.48k | £2.50k | £3.75k | £3.50k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.66k | £2.50k | £2.50k | £4.05k | £3.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 14 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JULY 2004 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 4 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN THE EAST MIDLANDS AND ITS ENVIRONS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE IN THE SAID AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING BY PROMOTING AND DEVELOPING GOOD PRACTICE AND FOSTERING CO-OPERATION BETWEEN FUNDERS AND SUCH ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
EAST MIDLANDS AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Funding Support
21 Richmond Gardens
Redhill
Nottingham
NG5 8JS
- Phone:
- 07739835909
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window