CRAWLEY ETHNIC MINORITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the charitable purpose for the benifit of the minority black and ethnic communities in the Borough of Crawley West Sussex and its surrounding area. They do this by working with individual communities helping to provide training and work shops. They also help fund surgeries for their members. The charity also works with the government to help improve the infrastructure support in West
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 November 2004: Standard registration
- CEMP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JALEEL MEEDIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN CHIKUKWA | Trustee | 23 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
NAWAZ AHMAD | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
BUBA CEESAY | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
HASHAM KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALEH AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KULTAR SINGH JOGI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Iyadh Daoud | Trustee |
|
||||||
RUBINA SHAHEEN SHAMIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAIZUL HASSAN FAIZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £5.70k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.73k | £2.39k | £2.91k | £1.77k | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MINORITY BLACK AND ETHNIC COMMUNITIES IN THE BOROUGH OF CRAWLEY WEST SUSSEX AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT" ) AS THE BOARD DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING, BY: 1. PROMOTING THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH: 2. ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION; 3. DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
FOR BLACK AND ETHNIC COMMUNITIES IN THE BOROUGH OF CRAWLEY WEST SUSSEX AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ORCHARD
1-2 GLENEAGLES COURT
BRIGHTON ROAD
CRAWLEY
WEST SUSSEX
RH10 6AD
- Phone:
- 01293657031
- Email:
- info@cemp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window