Financial history ARUN AND CHICHESTER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity Number: 1099640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £612.38k £1.05m £2.04m £4.01m £5.74m
Total expenditure £593.46k £975.20k £1.90m £3.80m £5.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £345.32k £611.39k £1.39m £3.43m £3.43m
Income - Donations and legacies £10.57k £2.59k £2.10k £4.03k £3.02k
Income - Other trading activities £10.33k £9.37k £13.57k £17.20k £12.34k
Income - Charitable activities £589.93k £1.04m £2.03m £3.99m £5.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.55k £967 £585 £2.86k £24.74k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £17.95k £7.05k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £589.83k £975.20k £1.90m £3.80m £5.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.63k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.08k £0 £7.33k £11.99k £15.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0