Financial history CVS SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity number: 1099702
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £252.74k £272.70k £259.51k £311.10k £290.09k
Total expenditure £246.86k £236.71k £244.80k £242.42k £246.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £154.50k
Income from government grants £170.45k £176.03k £194.19k £106.00k £60.00k