CVS SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the development of voluntary and community organisations in South Gloucestershire. We encourage networking and partnership building to share information, skills and knowledge. We provide training and fundraising advice and support the governance of our members. We enable representation of the sector to ensure their views are taken into account.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £154,500 from 2 government contract(s) and £60,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 September 2003: Standard registration
- CVS SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE (Working name)
- COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICES SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jay Gregg-Harris | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dibble | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Hendry | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Parsons | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERKELEY Spencer WILDE | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Gill | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK CRUTCHLEY | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Gee | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.74k | £272.70k | £259.51k | £311.10k | £290.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.86k | £236.71k | £244.80k | £242.42k | £246.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £154.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £170.45k | £176.03k | £194.19k | £106.00k | £60.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/05/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Gloucestershire Council
Library
44 West Walk
Yate
BRISTOL
BS37 4AX
- Phone:
- 01454865205
- Email:
- info@cvs-sg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window