Trustees CVS SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Charity number: 1099702

Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jay Gregg-Harris | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dibble | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Hendry | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Parsons | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERKELEY Spencer WILDE | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Gill | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK CRUTCHLEY | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Gee | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.