ANAMONGO WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF CONGOLESE PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK AND ABROAD, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID PEOPLE AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATION IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE PAUVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES TO RECREATION, WITH OBJECTIVES OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THE LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Cambridgeshire
- Camden
- Cardiff
- Cheshire East
- City Of London
- Durham
- Haringey
- Isle Of Anglesey
- West Sussex
- Angola
- Belgium
- Benin
- Cameroon
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ethiopia
- France
- Kenya
Governance
- 06 October 2003: Standard registration
- AWA (Working name)
- ANAMONGO WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- AWA INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- SECOND LIFE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENAJAMIN WAWA | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Lobilo | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lobilo Booto | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
AJAY ALI ARSANI | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Kamba | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £25.00k | £24.00k | £24.00k | £24.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.00k | £25.00k | £21.00k | £22.00k | £24.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/2003 AS AMENDED ON 03/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/2014 as amended on 18 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF CONGOLESE COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID PEOPLE AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES TO RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 St. Joseph's Road
LONDON
N9 8NH
- Phone:
- 07440605418
- Email:
- Aassociation44@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window