LYME DISEASE ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lyme Disease Action is campaigning to improve prevention, diagnosis & treatment of Lyme disease by 1) Making high-quality information on Lyme disease available, including via publications and conferences 2) Providing a help desk for public and health professionals 3) parliamentary lobbying 4) fostering scientific and medical education and research into Lyme disease and its associated diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 November 2003: Standard registration
- LYME DISEASE ASSOCIATION UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STELLA ROSEMARY HUYSHE-SHIRES BSc | Chair | 04 August 2007 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachael Pope | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PATRICK PYM BSC Hons | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr WENDY JANICE WRIGHT BSC DPHIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENZIL STUART SEARLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.44k | £32.47k | £9.68k | £18.37k | £16.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.49k | £4.95k | £6.58k | £10.40k | £46.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 November 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 OCTOBER 2003 as amended on 13 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LYME DISEASE, OTHER BORRELIOSES AND ASSOCIATED DISEASES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) RAISING AWARENESS IF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE INCLUDING, CONFERENCES, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT. (2) SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN TOPICS RELATED TO LYME DISEASE, OTHER BOORRELIOSES AND ASSOCIATED DISEASE, OTHER BORRELIOSES AND ASSOCIATED DISEASES PROVIDED THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH MUST BE PUBLISHED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 BRIDGE STREET
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 01395 597454
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window