Financial history THREE COUNTIES EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1102005
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.14m £2.41m £3.08m £1.97m £1.72m
Total expenditure £2.84m £2.14m £3.29m £2.07m £1.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £62.53k £30.99k £62.60k £46.69k £38.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £491.72k £1.87m £2.37m £513.11k £491.29k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £72.66k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £232.82k £462.26k £713.64k £13.59k £11.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1 £1 £4 £21 £21
Income - Other £1.41m £0 £0 £1.44m £1.22m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.88m £2.14m £3.29m £2.07m £1.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £990 £1.32k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.60k £5.90k £5.76k £8.34k £5.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £948.05k £125 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0