RIDEOUT CREATIVE ARTS FOR REHABILITATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rideout (Creative Arts for Rehabilitation) specialises in drama, theatre and multi-artform projects for prisoners, ex-offenders in the community, and other groups experiencing social exclusion including autistic adults and adults with learning disabilities. In addition we also deliver programmes that engage the general public in issues of criminal and social justice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Isabelle Swann | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Mary Leach | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Davies | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE KINNAIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH MOFFAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.66k | £37.22k | £29.75k | £25.70k | £46.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.66k | £30.05k | £25.40k | £35.22k | £41.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO AID THE REHABILITATION OF, AND ADVANCE EDUCATION OF PRISONERS, OFFENDERS AND EX-OFFENDERS IN THE COMMUNITY, AND YOUNG PEOPLE AT RISK, BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
64-72 Hartshill Road
Stoke-on-Trent
ST4 7RB
- Phone:
- 07940328428
- Email:
- admin@rideout.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window