Financial history EAST READING HORTICULTURAL THERAPY AND COMMUNITY BASED TRAINING LIMITED

Charity Number: 1099441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.79k £29.21k £39.60k £43.88k £54.77k
Total expenditure £46.37k £29.04k £45.34k £41.15k £46.90k
Income from government contracts £3.20k £8.56k £23.90k £3.36k £5.03k
Income from government grants N/A £3.62k £1.49k N/A N/A