THAMES VALLEY CHURCHES OF CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of Christian Religion and the relief of poverty in the United Kingdom and elsewhere throughout the world. Thames Valley Churches of Christ aims and continues to facilitate the worship of God and to promote the everyday application of Christs teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Lebanon
- Nepal
- Zambia
Governance
- 11 September 2003: Standard registration
- TVCOC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASMINDER SINGH MANKOO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER LAWRENCE BIRTLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.65k | £224.51k | £240.07k | £245.68k | £272.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.01k | £180.08k | £251.65k | £259.56k | £317.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 December 2023 | 399 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 December 2023 | 399 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2021 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2021 | 220 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2003. as amended on 21 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 DEEPCUT BRIDGE ROAD
DEEPCUT
CAMBERLEY
GU16 6SD
- Phone:
- 01276500894
- Email:
- dennis@thamesvalley.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window