THE SHELDON FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management and maintenance of and improvements to the Sheldon Field for the purposes of recreation, sport and wildlife to the benefit of the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 October 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JIM BESSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pauline Goodey | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Matthew Lymn Rose | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Habershon Wells | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil King | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cockayne | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Ward | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|||||
ALAN ARCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 06/10/2023 | 06/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.66k | £9.14k | £6.96k | £15.80k | £14.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.18k | £8.72k | £6.59k | £7.32k | £13.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.75k | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 October 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 October 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 12 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO USE THE PROPERTY AS A PLAYGROUND, PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND AND TO PROVIDE OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF BOTH THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE AND THE PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEACH COTTAGE
BACK LANE
CROPWELL BUTLER
NOTTINGHAM
NG12 3AD
- Phone:
- 01159334735
- Email:
- bessons@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window