BRIDGING THE GAP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping prisoners and ex-prisoners adjust to life outside. A comprehensive range of advice for releasees guides them to accommodation, training, employment and a crime-free life within their communities. Pre-release programmes include a penpal scheme, periodic writing competitions and life skills training. Advocacy, mediation, mentoring and help with form-filling etc also offered upon release.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 September 2003: Standard registration
- 08 April 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BRIDGING THE GAP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.31k | £374 | £315 | £303 | £4.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £438 | £2.35k | £75 | £0 | £193 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 01 July 2019 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE CARE, RESETTLEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS AND THE CARE AND SUPPORT OF THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY :- A) IS TO ASSIST, HELP, ADVICE AND SUPPORT ALL PERSONS IRRESPECTIVE OF NATIONALITY OR CREED. THIS IS FOR ALL PERSONS, MALE OR FEMALE, INCARCERATED IN PRISON, YOUNG OFFENDERS INSTITUTIONS AND OTHER SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS. THIS WILL ALSO INCLUDE THOSE PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN RELEASED FROM SUCH ESTABLISHMENTS OR INSTITUTIONS. THE ONLY CLAUSE IMPOSED IS THAT THESE PEOPLE HAVE A DESIRE TO LIVE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN A MANNER THAT PUTS THEIR PAST BEHIND THEM AND CAUSES THEM TO STRIVE TOWARDS BEING HONEST LAW ABIDING CITIZENS. B) IS TO GIVE HELP TO PEOPLE IN CUSTODY (AS DETAILED IN 'OBJECTIVE ONE'), AS WELL AS THOSE DISCHARGED ALONG WITH THEIR FAMILIES. THIS HELP IS EXERCISED IN FORM OF HELPING FIND ACCOMMODATION AND EMPLOYMENT, WITH THE AIM OF BUILDING THEIR CONFIDENCE AND SELF RESPECT WHICH WOULD HELP IN THEIR FEELING OF SECURITY. C) IS TO OFFER ADVICE AND GIVE SUPPORT TO THOSE PEOPLE AS DESCRIBED IN OBJECTIVE ONE. THIS IS DONE BEFORE RELEASE WHERE POSSIBLE, OR AFTER RELEASE IF NOT POSSIBLE BEFORE. AGAIN, THIS ADVICE AND SUPPORT IS GIVEN TO THE FAMILY IF REQUESTED. THIS SUPPORT IS AIMED TOWARDS THE NEEDS OF THESE PEOPLE UPON BEING RELEASED. THIS SUPPORT IS AIMED ON ENCOURAGING TOWARDS THE INDIVIDUALS DEVELOPMENT IN THEIR THINKING ABILITY, ALLOWING THEM TO DEVELOP TO A GREATER MATURITY AS INDIVIDUAL. THIS IN TURN WILL HAVE A POSITIVE OUTLOOK WITHIN ALL THE ACTIVITIES THIS PERSON CHOOSES TO DO, AND IN DOING SO WILL MAKE THEM WORTHY OF THE RESPECT OF OTHERS IN THEIR COMMUNITY AND AT WORK. THE MOST IMPORTANT THING TO BE NOTED IS THAT THIS IS ACHIEVED BY THE WORK OF THE INDIVIDUAL CONCERNED, IT IS THIS THAT WILL MAKE THE REAL DIFFERENCE AND A POSITIVE STEP FORWARD IN CHANGING A STYLE OF LIFE THAT SHOWED NO RESPECT FOR OTHERS IN THE PAST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window