Accounts and annual returns LEEDS GYPSY AND TRAVELLER EXCHANGE
Charity number: 1102149
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2007 | 08 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2007 | 08 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 December 2006 | 16 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2006 | 30 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | 24 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | 24 October 2006 | 328 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window