REVELEY LODGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To safeguard and maintain the property and gardens at Reveley Lodge, Bushey Herts, so that it can be used as an arts and educational resource and recreation for local schools and community activities and also to encourage and enhance the activities of the Bushey Museum, a separate charitable institution, as well as related community organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 October 2003: Standard registration
- 18 October 2023: Funds received from 1093501 THE BUSHEY ACTION ON DISABILITY GROUP
- BUSHEY MUSEUM PROPERTY TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Granville Taylor | Chair | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Ruth Edwards | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Ann Batten | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||||
James Hughes | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Glover | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Granville Taylor | Trustee | 21 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
RITA CASTLE | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.00k | £135.86k | £156.58k | £130.99k | £167.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.24k | £132.34k | £164.25k | £128.02k | £165.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | £14.79k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 20TH MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF BUSHEY IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORD BY THE PROVISION OF HISTORIC PROPERTIES AND GARDENS TO BE USED AS MUSEUMS AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
BUSHEY, HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 Elstree Road
Bushey Heath
BUSHEY
WD23 4GL
- Phone:
- 02089501017
- Email:
- info@reveleylodge.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window