NEUADD BRO FANA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public Hall and Recreation area for the use of residents of the community in and around the village of Ffarmers in Carmarthenshire, West Wales. The Trust Property is used for educational, social, religious and sporting activities for people of all age groups, without discrimination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 30 October 2003: Standard registration
- FARMERS VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ELFYN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELGAN LLOYD JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
THOMAS ROY JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN STUART PARRY MATHIAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRWEL GLYN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.54k | £27.02k | £30.80k | £23.36k | £29.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.68k | £4.99k | £12.39k | £6.94k | £9.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £3.00k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 12 MARCH 1931.
Charitable objects
TO PERMIT THE SAME TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE HAMLET OF CWMTWRCH IN THE PARISH OF CAIO IN THE COUNTY OF CARMARTHEN AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THESE PREMISES.
Area of benefit
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE HAMLET OF CWMTWRCH IN THE PARISH OF CAIO IN THE COUNTY OF CARMARTHEN AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TROED Y BRYN HOUSE
FFARMERS
LLANWRDA
SA19 8JG
- Phone:
- 01558650507
- Email:
- neuaddbrofana@ffarmers.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window