Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST JAMES THE GREAT, EAST MALLING

Charity number: 1099170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.55k £1.43k £1.43k £2.20k £3.52k
Total expenditure £22.19k £1.91k £192 £345 £6.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A