Financial history THE PREDATOR CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1099452
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £12.12k £7.70k £3.22k £17.00k £25.58k
Total expenditure £9.41k £9.37k £3.19k £17.34k £25.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0